Accounts and annual returns 3RD BEXHILL (ST. MICHAEL'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1058364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 January 2025 364 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 September 2021 241 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required