CORNWALL PARTNERSHIP FOUNDATION TRUST CHARITABLE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For any charitable purpose or purposes relating to the National Health Service wholly or mainly for the Cornwall Partnership NHS Trust
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cornwall
Governance
- CORNWALL HEALTHCARE TRUST CHARITABLE FUND (Previous name)
- CORNWALL PARTNERSHIP TRUST CHARITABLE FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dean Harvey | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Sweeney | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Miriam Maddison | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Newbury | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah James | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Stratford | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adie Perry | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Richards | Trustee | 25 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tamsyn Anderson Dr | Trustee | 05 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Schwarz | Trustee | 05 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Adrian Flynn | Trustee | 05 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Davis | Trustee | 05 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cornwall Partnership NHS Trust | Trustee | 01 March 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £692.00k | £336.00k | £90.00k | £38.00k | £172.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £248.00k | £257.00k | £136.00k | £55.00k | £53.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £432.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £250.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £394.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £157.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £90.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £18.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £132.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £1.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
02 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19/04/96 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 31 AUGUST 2010
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- BODMIN HOSPITAL GENERAL FUND
- BODMIN HOSPITAL GENERAL FUND
- BODMIN HOSPITAL MENTAL HEALTH FUND
- BOLITHO GENERAL FUND
- CAMBORNE / REDRUTH GENERAL FUND
- CAMBORNE/REDRUTH GENERAL FUND
- CHILDREN'S SERVICES FUND
- CORNWALL & ISLES OF SCILLY PCT CHARITABLE FUND
- CORNWALL & ISLES OF SCILLY PCT CHARITABLE TRUST FUND AND OTHER RELATED CHARITIES
- CORNWALL PRIMARY CARE TRUST FUNDS
- CORNWALL PRIMARY CARE TRUST FUNDS
- DEMENTIA INPATIENTS
- EAST CORNWALL GENERAL FUND
- EAST CORNWALL LEARNING DISABILITIES GENERAL CHARITY
- EDWARD HAIN GENERAL FUND
- EDWARD HAIN GENERAL FUND
- FALMOUTH HOSPITAL GENERAL FUND
- FALMOUTH HOSPITAL GENERAL FUND
- FOWEY GENERAL FUND
- FOWEY GENERAL FUND
- GWAYTEN GENERAL FUND
- HELSTON GENERAL FUND
- HELSTON GENERAL FUND
- LAMELLION GENERAL FUND
- LAUNCESTON GENERAL FUND
- LAUNCESTON GENERAL FUND
- LISKEARD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL GENERAL FUND
- LISKEARD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL GENERAL FUND
- LONGREACH HOUSE TRUST
- LOWER CARDREW GENERAL FUND
- MID CORNWALL LEARNING DISABILITIES GENERAL CHARITY
- NEWQUAY GENERAL FUND
- NEWQUAY GENERAL FUND
- PASSMORE EDWARDS GENERAL FUND
- POLTAIR GENERAL FUND
- POLTAIR GENERAL FUND
- SOWENNA CHARITABLE FUND
- ST AUSTELL COMMUNITY HOSPITAL GENERAL FUND
- ST AUSTELL COMMUNITY HOSPITAL GENERAL FUND
- ST AUSTELL GENERAL FUND
- ST LAWRENCE'S GENERAL FUND
- ST. BARNABAS GENERAL FUND
- ST. BARNABAS GENERAL FUND
- STRATTON GENERAL FUND
- STRATTON GENERAL FUND
- SUPPORTED DOMESTIC HOUSING FUND
- THE ALLSUP BEQUEST
- THE CORNWALL & ISLES OF SCILLY PCT RESEARCH FUND
- THE CORNWALL COMMUNITY GENERAL FUND
- THE CORNWALL COMMUNITY GENERAL FUND
- THE CORNWALL PARTNERSHIP NHS FOUNDATION TRUST (EXPENDABLE FUNDS) COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
- THE CORNWALL PARTNERSHIP RESEARCH FUND
- THE CORNWALL PARTNERSHIP TRUST GENERAL FUND
- THE TRELIL COURT CENTRE CHARITY
- THE VERA PALMER FUND
- THE VERA PALMER FUND
- THE WALTER BENTLEY FUND
- TRENGWEATH GENERAL FUND
- TREVILLIS GENERAL FUND
- WEST CORNWALL LEARNING DISABILITIES GENERAL CHARITY
- 08 January 2004 : Standard registration
- 21 November 2008 : Removed
- 21 November 2008 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
FINANCE DEPARTMENT
CAREW HOUSE
BEACON TECHNOLOGY PARK
DUNMERE ROAD
BODMIN
PL31 2QN
- Phone:
- 01208834627
- Email:
- leon.shanley@nhs.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window