THE HAMPSHIRE DOWN SHEEP BREEDERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's object and its principal activities continue to be that of breed society functions in recording pedigrees of Hampshire Down sheep and to promote the science and practice of agriculture by the encouragement of the breeding of Hampshire Down Sheep at home and abroad. The charity also undertakes research in the subject of sheep breeding, wool production and matters relating thereto.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

22 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Belgium
- France
- Ireland
- Netherlands
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 October 1996: Standard registration
- 2 HDSBA (Working name)
- HAMPSHIRE DOWN SHEEP BREEDERS ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roy McFarlane | Chair | 11 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Edward Brant | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steffan Harries | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Donald Henderson | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charles Richard Hurst | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Vincent | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Short | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Heywood | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD ADRIAN RUNDLE | Trustee | 27 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Andrew William Jones | Trustee | 27 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Harry Antony Elsden | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Kingsley Todd | Trustee | 27 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Allen George McFadden | Trustee | 27 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Lake | Trustee | 07 November 2016 |
|
|||||
Dr Stuart Anthony Jones | Trustee | 28 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Barnard | Trustee | 23 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH MARGARET GALBRAITH | Trustee | 17 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN MCCARTHY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN ISAAC SAMUEL MERCER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID MIDDLEDITCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES THOMAS BIRKWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TIMOTHY HUNTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.34k | £56.70k | £58.52k | £56.28k | £59.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.11k | £50.59k | £44.60k | £51.02k | £60.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 17 July 2020 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 17 July 2020 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 APRIL 1890 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17 JULY 1996 AND 25 OCTOBER 2003. AS AMENDED ON 03 NOV 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28 MAR 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 NOV 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO CARRY OUT BREED SOCIETY FUNCTIONS IN RECORDING PEDIGREES OF HAMPSHIRE DOWN SHEEP AND TO PROMOTE THE SCIENCE AND PRACTICE OF AGRICULTURE BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF BREEDING HAMPSHIRE DOWN SHEEP AT HOME AND ABROAD.
Area of benefit
HOME AND ABROAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wester Campsie Farm Steading
Lintrathen
KIRRIEMUIR
Angus
DD8 5JL
- Phone:
- 01700831652
- Email:
- janet@hampshiredown.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window