Financial history WATERSIDE GYMNASTICS CLUB

Charity Number: 1058407
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £90.91k £57.75k £81.69k £145.02k £138.06k
Total expenditure £99.47k £46.59k £74.41k £127.39k £146.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A