THE WORCESTERSHIRE MASONIC LIBRARY AND MUSEUM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Library & Museum facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 01 October 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Justin Trevelyan Parker | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|||||||
Paul Loy Wong | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Keith Martin Evans | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
ALAN TRANTOR ROBERTSON | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
John Phenix | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Dykes | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|||||||
STEPHEN J WYER | Trustee | 26 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.37k | £8.88k | £14.76k | £14.46k | £11.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.99k | £10.31k | £9.80k | £21.32k | £12.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £8.34k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 JUNE 1996 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 16 JUL 2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE FUTURE MAINTENANCE AND UPKEEP OF THE ASSETS OF AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE TRUST FUND AND OF FACILITIES AND ACCOMODATION FOR THE TIME BEING USED BY THE TRUST FUND AND FOR THE RELIEF OF SUCH POOR AND DISTRESSED BROTHER MASONS OR THEIR POOR AND DISTRESSED WIDOWS AND CHILDREN OR TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH MASONIC CHARITIES OR OTHER NON-MASONIC CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS SOCIETIES AND OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETINGS FROM TO TIME DIRECT PROVIDE THAT THE APPLICATION OF CAPITAL FOR THE SAID CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND THE APPLICATION OF MONEY (WHETHER CAPITAL OR INCOME) TOWARDS ANY PARTICULAR ONE OR MORE OF THE SIAD CHARITABLE PURPOSES SHALL BE SUBJECT TO SUCH RESTRICTIONS AND CONDITIONS (IF ANY) AS A DONAR MAY PRESCRIBE.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE WORCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
MASONIC HALL
RAINBOW HILL
WORCESTER
WR3 8LX
- Phone:
- 0190524971
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window