Essex & Suffolk Youth Enquiry Service Ltd

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the physical and mental health and social development of young people by the establishment of an information, conselling service in the Boroughs of Colchester and Tendring for those in need by means of their social economic, mental or physical circumstances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £144,835 from 4 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 02 October 1996: Standard registration
- TENDRING YOUTH ENQUIRY SERVICE (Working name)
- Y E S (Working name)
- COLCHESTER AND TENDRING YOUTH ENQUIRY SERVICE LTD (Previous name)
- COLCHESTER YOUTH ENQUIRY SERVICE (Previous name)
- COLCHESTER YOUTH ENQUIRY SERVICE LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Ann Williams | Chair | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Kelly | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alex Stephen O'Shaughnessy | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Josephine Blake | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Caroline Taylor | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Helen Milgate | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Wambui Wainaina | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Strangward | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £348.98k | £241.51k | £457.81k | £463.19k | £446.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £314.15k | £298.96k | £371.50k | £463.52k | £552.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £56.11k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £62.53k | £78.59k | £149.82k | £225.53k | £144.84k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/09/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18/05/2011 as amended on 01 Apr 2025 as amended on 11 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
To promote the physical and mental health and social development of young people by the establishment and operation of an information, advocacy and counselling service in North East Essex and Suffolk for those in need by reason of their social, economic, mental and physical circumstances
Area of benefit
COLCHESTER AND TENDRING
Contact information
- Address:
-
Colchester & Tendring Youth Enquiry
Services
9 Trinity Street
COLCHESTER
CO1 1JN
- Phone:
- 01206710771
- Email:
- info@colchesteryes.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window