Trustees Essex & Suffolk Youth Enquiry Service Ltd
Charity Number: 1058420

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Ann Williams | Chair | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Kelly | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alex Stephen O'Shaughnessy | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Josephine Blake | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Caroline Taylor | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Helen Milgate | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Wambui Wainaina | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Strangward | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.