Financial history ST MARY'S PTA

Charity number: 1058463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £21.10k £8.87k £5.80k £24.44k £3.92k
Total expenditure £12.13k £32.33k £4.21k £11.09k £2.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A