THE FRIENDS OF ROWAN ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
102 Education/training Makes grants to organisation. schools charities etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 07 October 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anuradha Brown | Chair | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Barbara Whittaker | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Achana Sanjeev | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Florentyna Abigail Courtenay Milford | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Raja | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.17k | £15.31k | £8.79k | £71.32k | £49.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.79k | £11.14k | £8.55k | £51.15k | £54.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 01 July 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 01 July 2020 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 07 FEB 1996 AS AMENDED ON 25 JUN 2015 as amended on 23 Jun 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT ROWAN PREPARATORY SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL .
Area of benefit
CLAYGATE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rowan Preparatory School
Rowan Hil
6 Fitzalan Road
Claygate
ESHER
- Phone:
- 01372 462627
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window