Financial history NORTH REDDISH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1058478
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.41k £4.73k £6.09k £9.49k £9.93k
Total expenditure £9.18k £4.73k £6.09k £9.49k £9.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A