Financial history BACK TO GOD EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN MINISTRY

Charity number: 1058513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.27k £5.12k £2.55k £3.39k £6.72k
Total expenditure £10.55k £4.43k £6.50k £3.23k £6.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A