MALT CROSS TRUST COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve for the benefit and education of the public the Malt Cross Music Hall. To provide a safe venue in the city of Nottingham which builds community, invests in artists, musicians and creative talent providing space to exihibit and perform. To provide teams of professionals and volunteers who go onto the streets of Nottingham at night to care for, protect and show love to people in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 09 October 1996: Standard registration
- THE MALT CROSS (Working name)
- MALT CROSS MUSIC HALL TRUST COMPANY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Giuseppe Piliero | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
CRAIG HENRY BERENS | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Will Wakefield | Trustee | 06 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £159.41k | £180.79k | £154.98k | £105.00k | £299.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £207.29k | £169.45k | £202.72k | £221.41k | £283.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £72.50k | £34.26k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/07/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/07/2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18/07/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/02/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06/03/2013
Charitable objects
1. TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT AND EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC THE BUILDING KNOWN AS THE MALT CROSS MUSIC HALL IN ST JAMES STREET IN THE CITY OF NOTTINGHAM. 2. TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE ARTS THROUGH THE PROMOTION, PRODUCTION, PERFORMANCE AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS. 3. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THEIR UNDERSTANDING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. 4. TO PROMOTE CRIME PREVENTION / REDUCTION MEASURES IN THE CITY PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OF NOTTINGHAM IN CONJUNCTION WITH POLICE AND VOLUNTARY AGENCIES; THE PROTECTION OF PEOPLE AND PROPERTY FROM AND THE PREVENTION OF CRIMINAL ACTS; THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF GREATER PUBLIC PARTICIPATION IN THE PREVENTION OF CRIME; AND THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, INFORMATION AND PRACTICAL ASSISTANCE. 5. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR LEISURE AND OTHER RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
CITY OF NOTTINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
16
St James's Street
Nottingham
Nottinghamshire
NG1 6FG
- Phone:
- 01159411048
- Email:
- info@maltcross.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window