Accounts and annual returns ASHA TRUST (UK)

Charity number: 1058568
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 March 2022 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required