TORNEDALE INFANT SCHOOL FUND

Charity Number: 1058573
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Raise funds to subsidise school visits, buy extra classroom equipment and provide entertainment such as theatre visits to school to broaden the experiences of the children in school.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018

Total income: £12,066
Total expenditure: £11,315

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Doncaster

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 October 1996: Standard registration
  • 29 March 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £15.34k £11.49k £9.95k £11.32k £12.07k
Total expenditure £9.77k £10.91k £7.94k £11.23k £11.32k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A £0 £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required