Accounts and annual returns HCS WORKNET

Charity number: 1058594
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2012 28 May 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2012 28 May 2013 On Time