Financial history HCS WORKNET

Charity number: 1058594
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2008 31/07/2009 31/07/2010 31/07/2011 31/07/2012
Total gross income £343.80k £315.16k £439.14k £362.16k £337.09k
Total expenditure £401.32k £323.78k £376.99k £360.08k £339.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A