Governing document LHR AIRPORT COMMUNITIES TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10/07/1996 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 26/09/1996 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 13/12/2005 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 28/01/2014 as amended on 16 Dec 2004 as amended on 25 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
(1) FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH MANNER AS MAY BE CHARITABLE PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE MAKING OF GRANTS AWARDS BURSARIES SCHOLARSHIPS DONATIONS AND OTHER FINANCIAL PAYMENTS TO PROMOTE: (1) THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL AMENITIES AND FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OF RESIDENTS LIVING NEAR PREMISES OWNED OR OPERATED BY BAA PLC AS ARE NOT PROVIDED FROM PUBLIC FUNDS; (11) THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF LAND OR OTHE RPROPERTY WHICH IS OF AESTHETIC OR SCIENTIFIC IMPORTANCE; AND (111) THE PROTECTION AND SAFEGUARDING OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND COUNTRYSIDE AND THE CONTROL AND REDUCTION OF POLLUTION. (2)(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE AREAS OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING AND BUSINESS ENTERPRISE; (11) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY THROUGH ASSISTING WITH OR OBTAINING EMPLOYMENT TRAINING FOR EMPLOYMENT OR GAINING WORK EXPERIENCE. (3) FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.