DARLINGTON BONDGATE ROUND TABLE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Round Table supports local needs together with large national charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Darlington
Governance
- 11 October 1996: Standard registration
- DARLINGTON BONDGATE ROUND TABLE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Justin Hayward | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Taylor-Garthwaite | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alex Taylor-Garthwaite | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karl Gordon | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.99k | £6.02k | £11.69k | £7.94k | £8.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.19k | £3.33k | £4.60k | £10.35k | £10.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 December 2024 | 321 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 April 2023 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 April 2021 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7 DECEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
SEE MODEL
Area of benefit
UK AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mitchell Gordon Llp
43 Coniscliffe Road
DARLINGTON
County Durham
DL3 7EH
- Phone:
- 01325368000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window