WARLEY TOWN J AND I SCHOOL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Primary school charity, 'Parents, Teachers, Friends of Warley Association' School Fund, various activities include, events, fundraising for school, fundraising for others, activities for children and to purchase extra resources and pay towards school events/treats.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Calderdale
Governance
- 11 October 1996: Standard registration
- WARLEY TOWN SCHOOL (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jenny Melling | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Heather Baim | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Taylor | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Brook | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jemma Tesseyman | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chris Griffiths | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Iain Frazer Lee | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Neil Kay | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gayle Standeven | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL RAZZELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.80k | £11.96k | £4.47k | £2.34k | £2.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.83k | £9.55k | £6.29k | £1.09k | £2.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 March 2025 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 March 2025 | 413 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28 MARCH 1996.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF WARLEY TOWN J AND I SCHOOL BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES IN AUGMENTATION OF SUCH FACILITIES FINANCED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATIONAL AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
DARK LANE
WARLEY
HALIFAX
WEST YORKSHIRE
HX2 7QD
- Phone:
- 01422831592
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window