Financial history STAFFORDSHIRE BULL TERRIER WELFARE

Charity number: 1058627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £98.06k £33.32k £34.36k £21.46k £60.15k
Total expenditure £189.14k £198.82k £35.62k £22.57k £104.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A