LADYBIRDS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ladybirds pre-school is a nursery school providing a fun learning environment for 2-4 year olds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 14 October 1996: Standard registration
- LADYBIRDS PRE-SCHOOL (Previous name)
- LADYBIRDS PRE-SCHOOL NEWBURY (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jean de Garis | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
sharon goldie | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher William West Wilson | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kris Richardson Smith | Trustee | 30 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.68k | £39.71k | £55.66k | £70.09k | £65.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.16k | £59.00k | £62.35k | £72.16k | £68.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22/04/1996 AS AMENDED ON 28/09/2009
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ladybirds Pre School
St. Francis Church Hall
Beatrice Road
Salisbury
SP1 3PN
- Phone:
- 01722 502234
- Email:
- ladybirdssp1@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window