Accounts and annual returns THE SAMLING FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1058654
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 14 September 2008 227 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 30 September 2008 243 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 30 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 15 December 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 23 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 23 January 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 10 November 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 10 November 2004 On Time