THE SAMLING FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the appreciation of operatic music To provide coaching for talented young individuals to further their skills and expertise To provide exhibitions and concert performances for the general public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 October 1996: Standard registration
- 04 November 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £262.88k | £248.96k | £348.18k | £378.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £316.10k | £166.57k | £301.31k | £207.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 14 September 2008 | 227 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 30 September 2008 | 243 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 30 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 15 December 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 23 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 23 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 10 November 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 10 November 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31 JULY 1996 AS AMENDED 16 DECEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
A) TO EDUCATE, DEVELOP, IMPROVE, ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE GENERALLY THE APPRECIATION OF THE ART OF SCIENCE AND MUSIC (BOTH VOCAL AND INSTRUMENTAL), THE SPOKEN AND WRITTEN WORD AND THE VISUAL ARTS IN ALL THEIR ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS, MASTER CLASSES, RECITALS EXHIBITIONS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE CHARITY BY ITS TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME B) TO PROVIDE COACHING AND GENERAL FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR TALENTED YOUNG INDIVIDUALS SELECTED BY THE TRUSTEES TO FURTHER THEIR KNOWLEDGE, SKILLS AND EXPERTISE IN ALL MATTERS WITH MUSIC (BOTH VOCAL AND INSTRUMENTAL) THE SPOKEN AND WRITTEN WORD AND THE VISUAL ARTS IN ALL THEIR ASPECTS C) TO PROVIDE FOR AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISIONS OF EXHIBITIONS, LECTURES, CLASSES AND DEMONSTRATIONS FOR MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC TO FURTHER AND INCREASE THEIR KNOWLEDGE UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF ALL MATTERS CONNECTED WITH MUSIC (BOTH VOCAL AND INSTRUMENTAL) THE SPOKEN AND WRITTEN WORD AND THE VISUAL ARTS IN ALL THEIR ASPECTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window