ISLAMIC CULTURAL AND EDUCATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ICEA provides provision to teach children Religious, Education and IT Skills. ICEA also provides space for over 2000+ worshippers. ICEA has an IT suite, a Library, a Community Hall as well as a Kitchen.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£502,443
Donations and legacies | £468.14k | |
Charitable activities | £34.31k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£507,224
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £507.22k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £507.22k |
People

18 Employee(s)
19 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
Governance
- 15 October 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hafiz Akhtar | Trustee | 14 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shehzad Sheikh | Trustee | 14 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mohammed Azam | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Saddiq | Trustee | 14 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Asad Hafeez | Trustee | 12 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Shaukat | Trustee | 12 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Choudhary Abdul Ghaffar Khan | Trustee | 12 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
GHAZANFAR ALI | Trustee | 13 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
JAWAID IQBAL | Trustee | 13 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
AZEEM MALIK | Trustee | 13 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
RAZAQ IQBAL | Trustee | 13 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Ashfaq | Trustee | 13 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MUNSAF DAD SADDIQ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ZULAFQAR ALI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ABDUL SATTAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAWOOD AHMED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED ISHAQ RASUL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED BASHIR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED KHALIQ | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £402.96k | £326.44k | £441.83k | £474.35k | £502.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £362.79k | £389.99k | £402.55k | £521.41k | £507.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £57.35k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £468.14k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £34.31k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £507.22k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £121.33k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.27m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £621.23k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £143.57k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 SEPTEMBER 1994 AS AMENDED 21 JULY 1996
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF ISLAM AND THE FIQH-I-HANFI (BRAILVI),TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIGIOUS EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ISLAMIC BELIEFS AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE PRIMARILY FOR THE FOLLOWERS OF THE FIQH-I-HANFI (BRAILVI) IN THE AREA OF BRADFORD SPECIFIED IN CLAUSE 5 BELOW WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
BRADFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
ICEA
101 Thornbury Road
BRADFORD
West Yorkshire
BD3 8SA
- Phone:
- 01274667986
- Email:
- info@icea.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window