Financial history COVENTRY WATCH MUSEUM PROJECT LIMITED

Charity number: 1058665
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £9.83k £3.77k £2.76k £4.48k £4.28k
Total expenditure £7.41k £5.95k £4.86k £5.12k £4.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A