THE FRIENDS OF THE CHURCH OF OUR LADY MEREVALE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of the Church of Our Lady, Merevale is an association of people who are concerned to promote the educational, cultural and heritage possibilities of this 770 year-old building and to allow a wider public to experience the spiritual ambience of the place.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 15 October 1996: Standard registration
- 25 April 2012: Removed (Funds spent up (s.75))
- FRIENDS OF MEREVALE CHURCH (Working name)
- THE FRIENDS OF MEREVALE CHURCH (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £519 | £421 | £396 | £384 | £427 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.58k | £0 | £125 | £612 | £100 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 01 June 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 04 June 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 07 February 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 SEPTEMBER 1994 AS AMENDED 13 SEPTEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO MAINTAIN, REPAIR, RESTORE, CONSERVE, PRESERVE, IMPROVE AND BEAUTIFY THE HISTORICAL ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF MEREVALE WITH BENTLEY AND WHATEVER OTHER OF THE HERITAGE OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND THE PARISH OF MEREVALE WITH BENTLEY 2) TO FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE PARISH BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF SUITABLE LAND, BUILDINGS AND EQUIPMENT
Area of benefit
IN AND AROUND THE PARISH OF MEREVALE WITH BENTLEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window