IRAQI WELFARE ASSOCIATION


Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
- The Charity Commission has opened an inquiry Open in new window into the charity
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The IWA Provides since 1991: * Free advice on All type of Benefits, Housing, Education, etc. * Free advice on Immigration and residency status in the UK * Family mediation and reconciliation * Children Camps and Social Family Gatherings * Free English Language, Training workshops and IT Courses * purchase & deliver clothes, presents and stationary to Orphans in Iraq
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£792,827
Donations and legacies | £763.76k | |
Charitable activities | £27.38k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.69k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£809,954
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £809.95k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £16,579 from 4 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £809.95k |
People

8 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Iraq
Governance
- 15 October 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR ABDUL SAHIB EL-RADHI | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mohammed Jamil | Trustee | 16 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Haidar Hassan | Trustee | 16 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Thamir Sadik Mohammed Hassan | Trustee | 16 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Adnan Abdulamir Hashim | Trustee | 16 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tariq Omran | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £907.97k | £359.69k | £994.85k | £1.19m | £792.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £923.04k | £413.31k | £914.45k | £1.12m | £809.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £12.00k | £53.27k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £28.89k | £14.00k | £32.85k | £16.58k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £895.97k | N/A | £899.82k | £1.15m | £763.76k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | £87.33k | £32.85k | £27.38k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £12.00k | N/A | £6.19k | £3.25k | £1.69k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | £1.51k | £2.98k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £923.04k | N/A | £743.64k | £700.14k | £809.95k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | £3.70k | £423.43k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | £0 | £294.24k | £6.31k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | £78.42k | £1.25k | £2.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | £167.11k | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £626 | N/A | £2.66k | £1.66k | £669 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £217.71k | N/A | £241.57k | £305.69k | £289.08k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £7.28k | N/A | £6.40k | £7.10k | £6.62k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 21 June 2023 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 21 June 2023 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 12 June 2022 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 12 June 2022 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 14 July 2021 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 14 July 2021 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 11 June 2020 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 11 June 2020 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 APRIL 1996 AS AMENDED 1 SEPTEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
1.TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST THE IRAQI COMMUNITY,PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND INTERPRETING SERVICES TO IRAQI REFUGEES;2.TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF CLASSES AND TRAINING TO MEMBERS OF THE IRAQI COMMUNITY;3.TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROTECT AND PRESERVE PUBLIC HEALTH,PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE,TRANSLATION ASSISTANCE TO PATIENTS AND EDUCATIONAL CLASSES ON HEALTH ISSUES;4.TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF THE PUBLIC WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE,PARTICULARLY,BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, BY THE PROVISION OF SUMMER CAMPS AND YOUTH AND COMMUNITY ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE,GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
85 York Street
LONDON
W1H 4QA
- Phone:
- 02045 295126
- Email:
- mail@iraqiwelfare.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window