WELSHPOOL COMMUNITY TRANSPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a community based transport service within a radius of 10 miles from Welshpool in Powys. Our participants using the scheme are given taxi tokens to enable them to access taxis operating on our behalf. The scheme is for the benefit of people who are disabled, elderly, frail or otherwise disadvantaged in terms of their mobility due to poverty, isolation, mental ill health or hardship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Powys
Governance
- 15 October 1996: Standard registration
- TAXI CARD SCHEME (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT ANDREW ROBINSON | Chair | 02 February 2012 |
|
|||||
Cynthia Ellen Rowland | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frances Elizabeth Robinson | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
ROGER CHARLES BROOKS | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ANN YEWDALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VALERIE EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL HARRIS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.19k | £8.09k | £12.08k | £7.88k | £7.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.59k | £5.09k | £7.56k | £6.92k | £10.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.87k | N/A | £10.33k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 JULY 1996 AS AMENDED ON 25 NOVEMBER 1996.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY BASED TRANSPORT SERVICE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE WITH IMPAIRED MOBILITY AND IN PARTICULAR FOR PEOPLE WHO ARE DISABLED,ELDERLY,FRAIL OR OTHERWISE DISADVANTAGED IN TERMS OF THEIR MOBILITY DUE TO POVERTY,ISOLATION,MENTAL ILL HEALTH OR HARDSHIP.
Area of benefit
WELSHPOOL AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 LEIGHTON PARK
LEIGHTON
WELSHPOOL
SY21 8LW
- Phone:
- 01938580459
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window