ST. JOHN THE BAPTIST V.P. SCHOOL HOME SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OUR ACTIVITIES INCLUDE RAISING FUNDS FOR ST JOHN THE BAPTIST V A SCHOOL BY ORGANISING COMMUNITY, NON PROFIT MAKING FUN EVENTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Flintshire
Governance
- 16 October 1996: Standard registration
- PENTROBIN SCHOOL HOME SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- ST. JOHN THE BAPTIST V.P. SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Latham | Chair | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Fiona Ratter Pugh | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amir Khalifa | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.98k | £2.86k | £3.82k | £6.97k | £7.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.47k | £1.43k | £1.47k | £6.85k | £3.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 SEPTEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED 12 OCTOBER 2000.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Peacehaven
Terrace Lane
Penyffordd
CHESTER
Flintshire
CH4 0HB
- Phone:
- 07568312616
- Email:
- Stjohnbaptist.hsa@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window