THE MEDIAE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In 2012-13 the Trust donated English text and reference books to 2 schools in Tanzania, and donated a digital camera to a secondary school in Kenya for a video/photography project. The Trust has also supported the Mediae Company's successful application to the EU to fund putting Makutano Junction into primary schools in the UK, as well as secondary schools in Poland, Bulgaria & Estonia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Kenya
- Rwanda
- Tanzania
- Uganda
Governance
- 16 October 1996: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON ALLEN | Chair | 05 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRIDGET HARNEY | Trustee | 28 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROSE MATOVU | Trustee | 13 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE PYKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £1 | £11.02k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £423 | £423 | £423 | £373 | £373 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 284 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 284 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 16 August 2023 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 21 October 2022 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 September 2021 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 14 August 2020 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 OCTOBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH,THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY,BY THE USE OF MEDIA IN EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT IN AFRICA,ASIA AND OTHER DEVELOPING COUNTRIES PRINCIPALLY IN THE FIELDS OF AGRICULTURE,ENVIRONMENT AND HEALTH AND ISSUES RELATING TO HUMAN RIGHTS AND BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND EDUCATION FOR THE ABOVE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Copyhold Road
East Grinstead
RH19 1DH
- Phone:
- 01342410063
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window