Accounts and annual returns DIVERSITY CHRISTIAN TRUST

Charity number: 1058709
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 February 2024 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 March 2023 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 March 2022 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 March 2021 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required