Financial history THE BURNHAM MEMORIAL RECREATION GROUND TRUST

Charity number: 1058710
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £200 £248 £168 £770 £938
Total expenditure £13.63k £11.42k £4.04k £0 £835
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A