Financial history KNIGHT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1058725
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £2.83k £2.46k £2.60k £3.18k £3.18k
Total expenditure £2.90k £2.90k £2.50k £2.65k £2.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A