LITTLE HEARTS MATTER
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
National charity providing support and information to families where a single ventricle heart condition has been diagnosed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 October 1996: Standard registration
- 06 May 2010: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 06 May 2010: Funds transferred to 1123290 LITTLE HEARTS MATTER
- LEFT HEART MATTERS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £190.19k | £218.95k | £244.26k | £266.56k | £271.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £140.18k | £202.58k | £244.97k | £212.43k | £238.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 27 November 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 29 May 2009 | 118 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 19 February 2008 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 25 February 2008 | 25 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 08 December 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 12 December 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 04 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 04 November 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 MAY 1996 AND AMENDED 1 JULY 2002, 5 OCTOBER 2003 AND 25 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
1) PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PERSONS AFFECTED BY A SINGULAR VENTRICLE CONDITION. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE MEDICAL PROFESSION AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC ON THE SUBJECT OF SINGLE VENTRICLE CONDITIONS AND THEIR IMPLICATIONS FOR THE FAMILY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window