Accounts and annual returns THE TURNPIKE TRUST

Charity number: 1058744
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 04 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required