DAILY LIFE LIMITED

Charity Number: 1058787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Daily Life Ltd is an Arts Council National Portfolio Organisation led by artist Bobby Baker. Daily Life Ltd aims to investigate and celebrate daily life and its limitations, promoting the abilities of people with lived experience of mental distress through the arts, collaborative research and diverse participation.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £432,492
Total expenditure: £384,693

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 October 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • BOBBY BAKER'S DAILY LIFE (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christoper Andrew Green Trustee 03 July 2023
None on record
Rehaab Daud Trustee 03 July 2023
None on record
Riah Jocelyn Charles Trustee 23 September 2020
None on record
Suzanne Alleyne Trustee 03 June 2020
None on record
Sharon Malika Booker Trustee 03 June 2020
None on record
Anthony Roberts Trustee 25 September 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £137.78k £114.08k £202.50k £133.39k £432.49k
Total expenditure £146.01k £101.13k £155.97k £152.93k £384.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £88.51k £109.48k £165.74k £110.06k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Studio 26
40 Cumberland Road
LONDON
N22 7BU
Phone:
02033010855