MILLAND AND RAKE CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting education in Milland and Rake Church of England School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 23 October 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV Patricia Bancroft | Chair | 01 December 2014 |
|
|||
David Dempsey | Trustee | 09 November 2024 |
|
|||
Peter Lindon | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|||
Stephanie Alison Garwood | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|||
Maureen Keel | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|||
Marilyn Collard | Trustee | 22 June 2016 |
|
|||
ROBERT IRELAND | Trustee | 25 November 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.79k | £8.18k | £8.68k | £9.29k | £9.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.07k | £7.74k | £10.64k | £11.49k | £1.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 1 MARCH 1996
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF A VOLUNTARY SCHOOL AND THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE,RAKE
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 MILL VALE MEADOWS
MILLAND
LIPHOOK
GU30 7LZ
- Phone:
- 01428741397
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window