Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF HUNSTANTON SURGERY

Charity Number: 1058807
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 22 August 2024 296 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 August 2024 661 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 August 2024 1026 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 November 2020 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required