Financial history TRAFFORD CHRISTIAN LIFE CENTRE

Charity Number: 1058810
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £113.55k £95.50k £107.06k £110.60k £111.28k
Total expenditure £112.99k £96.41k £99.83k £112.18k £114.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A