Financial history THE INA RUTLEDGE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1058811
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2004 05/04/2005 05/04/2006 05/04/2007 05/04/2008
Total gross income £7.06k £4.08k £2.42k £3.77k £2.60k
Total expenditure £33.98k £33.98k £32.50k £13.50k £14.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A