Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF THE SETTLE SWIMMING POOL

Charity number: 1058832
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 21 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 April 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 July 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 02 July 2018 On Time