Accounts and annual returns SNEYD GREEN OUT OF SCHOOL CARE GROUP
Charity number: 1058839

Charity reporting is overdue by 1639 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 178 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 178 days | |
Annual return | 05 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 544 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 544 days | |
Annual return | 05 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 909 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 909 days | |
Annual return | 05 January 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1274 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 January 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1274 days | |
Annual return | 05 January 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1639 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 January 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1639 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window