HAWTHORN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Community Association provides activites for residents in Hawthorn Village and the surrounding areas. These include regular coffee mornings and weekly activities as follows: bingo, mother & toddler group, art class, Yoga/Pilates sessions, craft class. We also organise a yearly craft fair and summer fair. Also, a Christmas Party is organised each year for the village children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Durham
Governance
- 24 October 1996: Standard registration
- 21 October 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 21 October 2015: Funds transferred to 1157023 HAWTHORN COMMUNITY CENTRE
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.85k | £6.73k | £5.03k | £4.89k | £7.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.73k | £4.16k | £3.45k | £4.87k | £5.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 15 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 22 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 30 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | 23 July 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 JUNE 1996 AS AMENDED BY NEW MODEL CONSTITUTION DATED 10 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO: (A) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, NATIONALITY, AGE, DISABILITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION PARTICULARLY FOR THOSE WHO, BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (B) ESTABLISH, OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT, OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS; THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION. THE AREA OF BENEFIT SHALL BE HAWTHORN AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
HAWTHORN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window