Financial history ORLEY FARM ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1058846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.40k £1.76k £16.66k £28.80k £28.07k
Total expenditure £28.88k £2.78k £11.08k £24.31k £23.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A