THORNTON HOUGH PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1058849
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fund raising by parents for the benefit of pupils and staff of Thornton Hough Primary School.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £7,301
Total expenditure: £11,122

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East
  • Cheshire West & Chester
  • Wirral

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 October 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SCHOOL FUND ACCOUNT (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
William Lowe Chair 01 December 2020
None on record
Jennifer Thomas Trustee 29 September 2022
None on record
Laura Elizabeth Fleet Trustee 29 September 2022
None on record
Alison Rogers Trustee 03 October 2018
None on record
Tracey Venables Trustee 26 September 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.68k £1.97k £2.04k £6.34k £7.30k
Total expenditure £10.94k £3.72k £1.29k £4.09k £11.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Thornton Hough Primary School
St. Georges Way
Wirral
CH63 1JJ
Phone:
01513363427
Website:

schoolofficethorntonhough.wirral.sch.uk