LAND REGISTRY (BIRKENHEAD OFFICE) CHARITY FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
raises money through staff collections to support local and national charitable and public organisations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 24 October 1996: Standard registration
- BIRKENHEAD DISTRICT LAND REGISTRY CHARITY FUND (Previous name)
- LAND REGISTRY (BIRKENHEAD OFFICES) CHARITY FUND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FIONA JANE HOLLAND | Chair | 12 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Jane Bentley | Trustee | 30 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Buckley | Trustee | 30 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.70k | £6.24k | £1.45k | £2.51k | £1.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.83k | £0 | £0 | £2.51k | £5.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED AS AMENDED 14 OCTOBER 1996 AND 23 OCTOBER 1997.
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE MAY DECIDE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Land Registry Birkenhead
Rosebrae Court
Woodside Ferry Approach
BIRKENHEAD
Merseyside
CH41 6DU
- Phone:
- 03000065424
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window