Accounts and annual returns THE POUND ARTS TRUST

Charity number: 1058872
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 25 August 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 16 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 04 February 2008 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 28 February 2008 28 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 17 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 17 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 12 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 12 January 2006 On Time