Financial history THE POUND ARTS TRUST

Charity number: 1058872
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £50.17k £72.15k £117.63k £82 £0
Total expenditure £53.77k £67.04k £94.34k £38.30k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A