Accounts and annual returns GREAT AYTON PLAY PARK

Charity number: 1058876
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2022 26 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 08 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 25 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required