BROMLEY GYPSY TRAVELLER COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advice and support to members of the Gypsy & Traveller community residing in or travelling through the London Borough of Bromley. This advice covers health,education,housing, employment, debt,health and safety, law concerns, welfare benefits, evictions - items covered by the CAB but specifically related to this community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bromley
Governance
- 28 October 1996: Standard registration
- BGTP (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMANDA MARTINS | Chair | 18 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
KERRY ANN RIPLEY | Trustee | 27 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
SIMON AVIS | Trustee | 18 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
JANE RANGER | Trustee | 18 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANITA LABAN | Trustee | 28 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA THOMPSON | Trustee | 28 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA MILLAR | Trustee | 28 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.81k | £71.29k | £62.07k | £32.53k | £47.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.07k | £43.11k | £65.67k | £37.58k | £56.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1986 AS AMENDED ON 14 OCTOBER 1996 AND COPY OF MINUTES DATED 5TH FEBRUARY 1998.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST GYPSIES AND TRAVELLERS IN THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF BROMLEY AND BEXLEY,PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ADVICE;TO ADVANCE EDUCATION,PARTICULARLY AMONGST THE AFOREMENTIONED GROUP AND BY THE PROVISION OF PLAYSCHEME AND PLAYGROUP FACILITIES;TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE PUBLIC HEALTH,PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE TO GYPSIES AND TRAVELLERS IN BROMLEY;TO ADVANCE THE ADMINISTRATION OF THE LAW AND PROMOTE,FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT,THE PROTECTION OF PEOPLE AND PROPERTY BY THE PREVENTION OF CRIMINAL ACTS,PARTICULARLY BY LIAISING WITH THE POLICE,PROBATION SERVICE AND THE COURTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE,LONDON BOROUGH OF BROMLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Nightingale Corner
Wotton Green
St. Mary Cray
Orpington
BR5 3PS
- Phone:
- 01689839052
- Email:
- thebgtp@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window